Reid v. Vaycayhero, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valentin Reid
Defendant: Vaycayhero, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05572
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Vaycayhero, Inc., issued on August 1, 2019. (dt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIRMATION of David P. Force, Esq. in Support. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney David Force to RE-FILE Document #7 FIRST MOTION for Entry of Default as to Vaycayhero, Inc. . Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. The request to enter default is no longer needed. Re-file the proposed clerk's certificate as one entry, (the certificate that you filed is not as to form. Please use the sample clerk's certificate that is on our website. The clerk's certificate is filed under proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default), then file the affidavit in support as a separate entry. (Filed under other answers, affidavit in support of a non-motion). (km) Modified on 7/26/2019 (km).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Entry of Default as to Vaycayhero, Inc. . Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Supplement)(Force, David) Modified on 7/26/2019 (km).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, October 18, 2019 at 3:00pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/15/2019) (kv)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Vaycayhero, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service was accepted by Jolita Quindara. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vaycayhero, Inc.. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Paul Force. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Valentin Reid. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vaycahero, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Force, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vaycayhero, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17085089)Document filed by Valentin Reid.(Force, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Vaycayhero, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaycayhero, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentin Reid
Represented By: David Paul Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?