Jonas v. Noble Construction Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tamas Jonas
Defendant: BLDG 44 Developers LLC, Noble Construction Group, LLC and BLDG 44 LI LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05574
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. BLDG 44 Developers LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. BLDG 44 LI LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Noble Construction Group, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/24/2019) (mro)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/24/2019) (mro)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Holly Ostrov Ronai to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the PDF must say 'Amended'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Noble Construction Group, LLC, re: #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jgo).
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLDG 44 LI LLC, re: #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jgo).
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLDG 44 DEVELOPERS LLC, re: #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jgo).
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against BLDG 44 Developers LLC, BLDG 44 LI LLC, Noble Construction Group, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tamas Jonas. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Ronai, Holly)
June 18, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #11 . The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ne)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/18/2019) (ne)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, no later than July 2, 2019, Plaintiff shall amend his Complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising each of the Defendant LLCs. If Plaintiff does not amend the Complaint to adequately allege the parties citizenship by that date, the Court will dismiss this action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction without further notice. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2019.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/18/2019) (ne)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLDG 44 Developers LLC. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLDG 44 LI LLC. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Noble Construction Group, LLC. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Holly Ostrov Ronai. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Noble Construction Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLDG 44 LI LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLDG 44 DEVELOPERS LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tamas Jonas. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLDG 44 Developers LLC, BLDG 44 LI LLC, Noble Construction Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17085373)Document filed by Tamas Jonas.(Ronai, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonas v. Noble Construction Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLDG 44 Developers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Construction Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLDG 44 LI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamas Jonas
Represented By: Holly Ostrov Ronai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?