Corrales-Patino v. Procida Construction Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino
Defendant: The Gilbert on First LLC, Gilbert Middle Condo LLC, Draper Family Housing Development Fund Corporation and Procida Construction Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05579
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John V. Fabiani dated 8/12/2019. Document filed by Procida Construction Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation extending time to answer)(Fabiani, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John V. Fabiani dated 7/31/2019. Document filed by Procida Construction Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation extending time to answer)(Fabiani, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the defendant PROCIDA CONSTRUCTION CORP.'s time to answer the Complaint and Jury Demand in the above-captioned entitled action, be and the same hereby is extended up to and including August 13, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the defendants will not raise the defense of improper service. SO ORDERED. Procida Construction Corp. answer due 8/13/2019. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/1/2019) (ne)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John V. Fabiani dated 7/31/2019 re: stipulation extending time to answer complaint and jury demand. Document filed by Procida Construction Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation extending time to answer)(Fabiani, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Vincent Fabiani, Jr on behalf of Procida Construction Corp.. (Fabiani, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Draper Family Housing Development Fund Corporation served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Procida Construction Corp. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Gilbert on First LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Gilbert Middle Condo LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Gilbert on First LLC. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Procida Construction Corp.. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gilbert Middle Condo LLC. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Draper Family Housing Development Fund Corporation. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Holly Ostrov Ronai. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,999;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Procida Construction Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gilbert Middle Condo LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Gilbert on First LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Draper Family Housing Development Fund Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ronai, Holly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Draper Family Housing Development Fund Corporation, Gilbert Middle Condo LLC, Procida Construction Corp., The Gilbert on First LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17086285)Document filed by Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino.(Ronai, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corrales-Patino v. Procida Construction Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gilbert on First LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Middle Condo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draper Family Housing Development Fund Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procida Construction Corp.
Represented By: John Vincent Fabiani, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Corrales-Patino
Represented By: Holly Ostrov Ronai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?