Corrado v. Cushman & Wakefield Inc.
Plaintiff: Nadine Corrado
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05614
Filed: June 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:020
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 9/26/19 10 AM at Mediator's office.(smc)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/22/2019.(ah)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/22/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/13/2016) (mf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Kelly on behalf of Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff NADINE CORRADO and Defendant CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC. that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) is hereby extended to August 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Cushman & Wakefield Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/2/2019) (rj)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (dnh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nadine Corrado. (Liszka, Zachary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liszka, Zachary)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Zachary J Liszka. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17091725)Document filed by Nadine Corrado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Wage Notice)(Liszka, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corrado v. Cushman & Wakefield Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Corrado
Represented By: Zachary J Liszka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?