Wright v. Mercer (US) Inc.
Plaintiff: Courtney Wright
Defendant: Mercer (US) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05615
Filed: June 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/16/2019.(mf)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the August 8, 2019, initial pretrial conference is CANCELLED. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant seeks to file a motion to dismiss, it shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2. It is further ORDERED, regarding settlement discussions, the parties' request for a referral for mediation is GRANTED. The referral will issue in a separate order. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/5/2019) (jca)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. To the extent possible, the Mediation Program is directed to appoint a mediator with expertise in employment discrimination cases. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/15/2019. Mediator Expertise Request due by 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/5/2019) (jca) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Settlement discussions have taken place. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: Plaintiff's estimated length of trial is 8 days. Defendant believes that since plaintiff was employed for only 4 months, the trial should last no more than 4 days. Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 10/9/2019. Deposition due by 12/6/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/20/2020. Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar. (And as further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/2/2019) (jca)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Mercer (US) Inc.. (Garland, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David W. Garland dated August 1, 2019 re: Submitted in Advance of the August 8, 2019 Initial Scheduling Conference. Document filed by Mercer (US) Inc..(Garland, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shira M. Blank on behalf of Mercer (US) Inc.. (Blank, Shira)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Wayne Garland on behalf of Mercer (US) Inc.. (Garland, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Keenan, Edward)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mercer (US) Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Document filed by Courtney Wright. (Keenan, Edward)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Conference Order and Individual Rules. Document filed by Courtney Wright. (Keenan, Edward)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/25/2019) (mro)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mercer (US) Inc.. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Edward Emmett Keenan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet not signed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
June 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mercer (US) Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Courtney Wright. (Keenan, Edward)
June 16, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Keenan, Edward) Modified on 6/17/2019 (dnh).
June 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mercer (US) Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17091794)Document filed by Courtney Wright.(Keenan, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Mercer (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Wright
Represented By: Edward Emmett Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer (US) Inc.
Represented By: David Wayne Garland
Represented By: Shira M. Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?