Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Control-Finance Limited et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Benjamin Reynolds and Control-Finance Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv05631
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Julia Claire Colarusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Julia Claire Colarusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit and Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colarusso, Julia) Modified on 8/12/2019 (wb).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Luke B. Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/7/2019) (rro)
July 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Luke Blair Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Luke Blair Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, Luke)
July 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Control-Finance Limited. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Reynolds. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonah Eric McCarthy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Commodity Futures Trading Commission. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonah Eric McCarthy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Reynolds, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (McCarthy, Jonah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Control-Finance Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (McCarthy, Jonah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCarthy, Jonah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Control-Finance Limited, Benjamin Reynolds. Document filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission.(McCarthy, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Control-Finance Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Control-Finance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Jonah Eric McCarthy
Represented By: Julia Claire Colarusso
Represented By: Luke Blair Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?