The New York Times Company et al v. Food and Drug Administration
Plaintiff: Natasha Singer, Danielle Ivory and The New York Times Company
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration and Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv05640
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Food and Drug Administration.(Rovner, Allison)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/19/2019) (jca)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Food and Drug Administration. (dnh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Food and Drug Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Danielle Ivory, Natasha Singer, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name on summons and caption title must match the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Food and Drug Administration. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Danielle Ivory, Natasha Singer, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) Modified on 6/18/2019 (pc).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Robinson Green on behalf of Danielle Ivory, Natasha Singer, The New York Times Company. (Green, Dana)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17099253)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Natasha Singer, Danielle Ivory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCraw, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The New York Times Company et al v. Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Singer
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Represented By: Dana Robinson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Ivory
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Represented By: Dana Robinson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York Times Company
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Represented By: Dana Robinson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?