Lezcano v. Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Anneth Lezcano
Defendant: Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05645
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc..(Benson, Ryan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dolce & Gabbana S.r.l for Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.. Document filed by Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc..(Benson, Ryan)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The Court will hold a telephone conference on August 23, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel is directed to initiate the call jointly to my chambers, on that date. 2. The parties are directed to submit, no later than August 16, 2019, a jointly proposed discovery plan, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This submission should address all of the matters set out in Rule 26(f)(3), and should specifically include proposed deadlines for: a. service of initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1); b. service of initial document requests and interrogatories; c. any motion for joinder of other parties or amendment of the pleadings; d. completion of fact discovery; and e. expert disclosures and the completion of expert discovery, if any. 3. Counsel should fax a copy of their proposed discovery plan to the Chambers of the undersigned, at (212) 805-4658. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 7/22/2019) Telephone Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (ks)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Ryan T. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 7/18/2019) (rro) Modified on 7/19/2019 (rro).
July 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Ryan T. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17253670. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Ryan T. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17253670. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Benson, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares - Authorize to Accept. Document filed by Anneth Lezcano. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/19/2019) (ks)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.. (sj)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stamatios Stamoulis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anneth Lezcano. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17100561)Document filed by Anneth Lezcano.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lezcano v. Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolce & Gabbana USA Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anneth Lezcano
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?