White et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Y. Michelle White
Defendant: New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association, Bank of America N.A. and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05653
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Western District of Texas acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:19-cv-00776, filed on 08/02/2019. (sjo)
August 1, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of Texas (jwh)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re: #28 Letter filed by Y. Michelle White: The Court agrees that a transfer is warranted, insofar as the case originated in the Western District of Texas and the property in dispute is located there. The Clerk of Court is therefore directed to transfer this litigation to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2019) (jwh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Declaration of Heather Elizabeth Saydah re: #28 Letter, #26 Order,. Document filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Saydah, Heather)
July 31, 2019 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer dated 07/31/2019 re: Joint Letter To Court. Document filed by Y. Michelle White.(Kelly, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather Elizabeth Saydah on behalf of Bank of America N.A.. (Saydah, Heather)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court directs that such a letter be submitted by 5 p.m. on July 31, 2019, and be accompanied by a sworn declaration from counsel from each side accounting for the failure to heed this deadline. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/30/2019) (anc)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on: PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JOINT LETTER: granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/17/2019) (ama)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Document filed by Y. Michelle White.(Kelly, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: In order to facilitate the Court's supervision of these cases, the Court directs counsel for all parties to file a joint letter, not exceeding three pages in length, to be submitted to the Court no later than July 15, 2019, addressing the following topics in separate paragraphs: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claim(s) and defense(s); (2) the litigation history of the case; (3) any pending or anticipated motions; and (4) the parties' views as to next steps in the litigation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/08/2019) (ama) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ama).
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
June 18, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Western; Case Number: 1:18-cv-00790. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TRANSFERRING this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #20 MOTION for Order to Show Cause To Retain Case Consistent with Final Order Partially Lifting Stay. Filer selected a motion event, but the document is accepted as a Response to the Order to Show Cause. Correction has been made; no further action is required. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Order #16 to Show Cause To Retain Case Consistent with Final Order Partially Lifting Stay by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). (Smith, S.) Modified on 5/13/2019 (lt). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Order to Show Cause, by Ditech Financial, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Smith, S.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE To The Court by Y. Michelle White re #16 Order to Show Cause, (McMahon, Keith) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that on or before 5/3/2019 the parties shall SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING, why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York to be administered by the bankruptcy court of that district. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Notice of Correction to S. Smith: re #15 Attachment Exhibits A and B to Notice of Bankruptcy Filing. Please take note: all filings must be in proper pleading format including case style, heading, attorney signature, and certificate of service, when a certificate of service is required under the rules. Also, the ATTACHMENT event should not be used unless you are instructed to do so. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT Exhibits A and B to Notice of Bankruptcy filing to #14 Notice (Other) by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Smith, S.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay by Ditech Financial, LLC (Smith, S.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ditech Financial, LLC, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association, Defendant Ditech Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, S.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Y. Michelle White, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association, Defendant Ditech Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit Assignment of DOT, #4 Exhibit Assignment of DOT, #5 Exhibit Corporate Assignment of DOT, #6 Exhibit Assignment of DOT, #7 Exhibit Notice of Sale, #8 Exhibit Ditech Payment, #9 Exhibit Signed TRO)(Kelly, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Mark Lane. The Response to Dkt. #8 is due no later than November 9, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Y. Michelle White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order unopposed). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Kelly, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE all claims alleged in this action by Plaintiff Y. Michelle White against Defendant SFMC, LP. ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT SFMC, LP's #6 MOTION to Dismiss. ORDER regarding case style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Y. Michelle White (Kelly, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Ditech Financial, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Smith, S.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Gutierrez, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by SFMC, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Behrens, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Set Deadlines: Ditech Financial, LLC answer due 10/5/2018; Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 10/5/2018. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Mark Lane. The Motion is granted as unopposed pursuant to Dkt. #5. The deadline is extended to October 5, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Ditech Financial, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gutierrez, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Gutierrez, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING all pending and future discovery motions as well as all other nondispositive motions in this case to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. ORDER REFERRING all pending and future dispositive motions in this case to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 14, 2018 COMPLAINT, filed by Y. Michelle White. [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11232622), filed by Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Smith, S.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Melissa S. Gutierrez
Represented By: S. David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Saydah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: S. David Smith
Represented By: Melissa S. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. Michelle White
Represented By: Keith Steven McMahon
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Kelly
Represented By: Lawrence E. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?