Steele v. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Steele
Defendant: Trustee Suleman Lunat, Trustee Edwin Cespedes, Principal Michael LaFrancis, Trustee Andrew D. Stone, Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., Trustee Bryan Binder, Trustee Samuel A. Cole, Trustee Jarett Posner, Brian Levine, Lorenzo Smith, III, Trustee Gregory Sawers, CEO Eva Moskowitz, Success Academy Charter School Hell's Kitchen, Trustee Scott Friedman, Trustee Derrell Bradford, Jarett Posner, Eva Moskowitz, Andrew D. Stone, Michael LaFrancis, Bryan Binder, Derrell Bradford, Suleman Lunat, John Doe ##1-4, Edwin Cespedes, Samuel A. Cole, Gregory Sawers and Scott Friedman
Case Number: 1:2019cv05659
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 29:794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, October 11, 2019 at 3:30pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/15/2019) (kv)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Leo Glickman to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant name contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc.. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew D. Stone. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lorenzo Smith, III. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eva Moskowitz. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suleman Lunat. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Levine. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Success Academy Charter School Hell's Kitchen. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott Friedman. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edwin Cespedes. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Derrell Bradford. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samuel A. Cole. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryan Binder. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew D. Stone, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lorenzo Smith III, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jarett Posner, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo) Modified on 7/2/2019 (dnh).
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief executive Officer Eva Moskowitz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suleman Lunat, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Levine, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael LaFrancis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo) Modified on 7/2/2019 (dnh).
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Success Academy Charter School Hell's Kitchen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scott Friedman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edwin Cespedes, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Derrell Bradford, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samuel A. Cole, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bryan Binder, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Glickman, Leo)
June 19, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Bryan Binder, Derrell Bradford, Edwin Cespedes, Samuel A. Cole, Scott Friedman, Michael LaFrancis, Brian Levine, Suleman Lunat, Eva Moskowitz, Jarett Posner, Gregory Sawers, Lorenzo Smith, III, Andrew D. Stone, Success Academy Charter School Hell's Kitchen, Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., John Doe #1-4 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Valerie Steele. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Glickman, Leo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glickman, Leo)
June 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Leo Glickman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Valerie Steele; Samuel A. Cole; Bryan Binder; Scott Friedman; Gregory Sawers; Edwin Cespedes; Derrell Bradford; Brian Levine; Suleman Lunat; Jarett Posner; Lorenzo Smith, III; Andrew D. Stone; Eva Moskowitz; Michael LaFrancis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; party text was added. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Leo Glickman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Leo Glickman re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party John Doe #1-4;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan Binder, Derrell Bradford, Edwin Cespedes, Samuel A. Cole, Scott Friedman, Michael LaFrancis, Brian Levine, Suleman Lunat, Eva Moskowitz, Jarett Posner, Gregory Sawers, Lorenzo Smith, III, Andrew D. Stone, Success Academy Charter School Hell's Kitchen, Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17102729)Document filed by Valerie Steele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Glickman, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Suleman Lunat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Edwin Cespedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Michael LaFrancis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Andrew D. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Bryan Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Samuel A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Jarett Posner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Gregory Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Eva Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Academy Charter School Hell's Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Derrell Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarett Posner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael LaFrancis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrell Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suleman Lunat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ##1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Cespedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Steele
Represented By: Leo Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?