Strathmore Insurance Company v. The Burlington Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Strathmore Insurance Company
Defendant: The Burlington Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05772
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference initially scheduled for September 11, 2019 is hereby ADJOURNED to Thursday, September 26, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Accordingly, the parties' Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Case Management Plan shall be filed by September 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/7/2019) (rjm)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties shall jointly email Chambers, providing the parties' availability for the week of September 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/6/2019) (rro)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Yale Glazer, Esq. dated August 6, 2019. Document filed by The Burlington Insurance Company.(Glazer, Yale)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 20D, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/5/2019) (mro)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/2/2019) (ne)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Counterclaim. Document filed by Strathmore Insurance Company.(Messier, Jonathan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company for Strathmore Insurance Company. Document filed by Strathmore Insurance Company.(Messier, Jonathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653057/2019..Document filed by The Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court, New York County Summons and Complaint Served on Burlington)(Glazer, Yale)
June 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yale Howard Glazer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yale Howard Glazer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney; pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be filed as attachments to pleading and labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Strathmore Insurance Company. Document filed by The Burlington Insurance Company.(Glazer, Yale)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Anthony Messier on behalf of Strathmore Insurance Company. (Messier, Jonathan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Guilford Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Alamance Insurance company, Corporate Parent Burlington Insurance Group, Incorporated, Corporate Parent International Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent First Financial Insurance Company, Corporate Parent FFIC Holdings Incorporated for The Burlington Insurance Company. Document filed by The Burlington Insurance Company.(Glazer, Yale)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glazer, Yale)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653057/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17114919).Document filed by The Burlington Insurance Company.(Glazer, Yale) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strathmore Insurance Company v. The Burlington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strathmore Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Messier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Burlington Insurance Company
Represented By: Yale Howard Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?