Cedeno v. Department of Education of the City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Abel Cedeno
Defendant: Department of Education of the City of New York, John or Jane Doe, Ms. Jaconbi, Jeannie Gallego, John or Jane Doe 2, Chancellor Richard A Carranza, Richard A Carranza, John or Jane Doe 1 and Ms. Jacobi
Case Number: 1:2019cv05776
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Richard A Carranza served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service was accepted by Inez Contrera, Docket Clerk. Document filed by Abel Cedeno. (Shanahan, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/15/2019) (kgo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard A Carranza, Department of Education of the City of New York, John or Jane Doe 2, Jeannie Gallego, Ms. Jacobi, John or Jane Doe 1. (dnh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Education of the City of New York, Richard A. Carranza, John or Jane Doe 1, John or Jane Doe 2, Jeannie Gallego, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Abel Cedeno. (Shanahan, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas D. Shanahan to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Write the name of each party you are requesting a summons for on the docket entry. Not 'Department of Education, et al.';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Education, et al., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Abel Cedeno. (Shanahan, Thomas) Modified on 6/28/2019 (pc).
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas D. Shanahan to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Caption Error; if the entire caption does not fit in the caption section of the PDF, list the leading defendant followed by 'et al' (Abel Cedeno v. Department of Education of the City of New York et al). Defendant 'To' section must not be altered, 'see attached' may be listed on the summons PFD in reference to the attached rider. On the rider, defendant names must exactly match the party names as they appear on the initial pleading. If party text is included on the rider it must also exactly match the party text as it reads on the initial pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, RICHARD A. CARRANZA, As Chancellor of the Department of Education, MS JACOBI, in her capacity as the former Principal of the now closed Wildlife Conservation Highschool, JOHN OR JANE DOE 1, the Principal of I.S. 117 during the period Plaintiff was a student, JOHN OR JANE DOE 2, the Principal of M.S. 318 during the period Plaintiff was a student, JEANNIE GALLEGO, in her capacity as Acting Title IX Coordinator for the Department of Education, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Abel Cedeno. (Shanahan, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2019 (dnh).
June 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas D. Shanahan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; If party text is included on the summons PDF, it must exactly match the party text on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Education of the City of New York, Richard A. Carranza, Ms. Jacobi, John or Jane Doe 1, John or Jane Doe 2, Jeannie Gallego, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Abel Cedeno. (Shanahan, Thomas) Modified on 6/25/2019 (dnh).
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas D. Shanahan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed initial pleading (Doc. 5); party name on the 'as to' docket entry text does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas D. Shanahan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Richard A Carranza; Ms. Jacobi; John or Jane Doe 1; John or Jane Doe 2; Jeannie Gallego. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 22, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Richard A Carranza, Department of Education of the City of New York, John or Jane Doe, John or Jane Doe 2, Jeannie Gallego, Ms. Jaconbi. Document filed by Abel Cedeno.(Shanahan, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas D. Shanahan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF must be titled and correspond with the event type. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/26/2019. (jgo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Abel Cedeno.(Shanahan, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shanahan, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Education, Carranaza, Jacobi, John or Jane Doe 1, John or Jane Doe 2, Gallego, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Abel Cedeno. (Shanahan, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2019 (jgo).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Richard A Carranza, Department of Education of the City of New York, John or Jane Doe, John or Jane Doe 2, Jeannie Gallego, Ms. Jaconbi. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17115791)Document filed by Abel Cedeno.(Shanahan, Thomas) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedeno v. Department of Education of the City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Education of the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Jaconbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Gallego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor Richard A Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Cedeno
Represented By: Thomas D. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?