Araujo v. E. Mishan & Sons, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Araujo William and William Araujo
Defendant: ABC Corporation 1 through 10, EMSON USA, Robin Roe 1 through 10, E. Mishan & Sons, Inc., Emson Products, Inc, Emson, Inc. and Forgot My Souvenirs LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05785
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Forgot My Souvenirs LLC. (dnh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emson, Inc.. (dnh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emson USA. (dnh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emson Products, Inc. (dnh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Forgot My Souvenirs, LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by William Araujo. (Haidri, Amirali)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emson, Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by William Araujo. (Haidri, Amirali)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emson USA, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by William Araujo. (Haidri, Amirali)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emson Products, Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by William Araujo. (Haidri, Amirali)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to E. Mishan & Sons, Inc, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by William Araujo. (Haidri, Amirali)
August 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Amirali Y Haidri to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. If the entire caption does not fit, list the leading party followed by 'et al.' Each summons request must be filed as a separate event or one summons may be issued to multiple parties by attaching a rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to E. Mishan & Sons, Inc., Emson, Inc., Emson Products, Inc. Emson USA, Forgot My Souvenirs, LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by William Araujo. (Haidri, Amirali) Modified on 8/6/2019 (dnh).
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Haidri, Amirali)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporation 1 through 10, E. Mishan & Sons, Inc., Emson Products, Inc, Emson USA, Emson, Inc., Forgot My Souvenirs LLC, Robin Roe 1 through 10. Document filed by William Araujo.(Haidri, Amirali)
June 21, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
June 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amirali Y Haidri. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1341; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code pend (IFP pending);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Amirali Y Haidri to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amirali Y Haidri. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Araujo William, EMSON USA, Robin Roe 1 through 10, ABC Corporation 1 through 10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Amirali Y Haidri to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Amirali Y Haidri. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17117770)Document filed by Araujo William.(Haidri, Amirali) Modified on 6/21/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Araujo v. E. Mishan & Sons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMSON USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Roe 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emson Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forgot My Souvenirs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Araujo William
Represented By: Amirali Y Haidri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Araujo
Represented By: Amirali Y Haidri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?