Nachshen v. SC 150-152 West 24 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Defendant: Zauo Inc. and SC 150-152 West 24 LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05838
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Zauo Inc..(Ji, Younghoon)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zauo Inc..(Ji, Younghoon)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT ZAUO INC.'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE AGAINST, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Plaintiff, STEVEN NACHSHEN, and the Defendant, ZAUO INC. ("Defendant"), through their undersigned attorneys, that the time for Defendant to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint in the above-captioned action shall be extended up to and including August 16, 2019. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendant expressly reserves, any and all defenses. There has been no previous request for extension of time in connection with this matter. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the Parties hereby consent to electronic service of all documents pursuant to Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, each of which shall constitute an original when at least one such counterpart has been signed by each Party, and that electronically-submitted and facsimile signatures shall be deemed originals for all purposes. SO ORDERED. Zauo Inc. answer due 8/16/2019. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/29/2019) (ne)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Zauo Inc.. (Ji, Younghoon)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Younghoon Ji on behalf of Zauo Inc.. (Ji, Younghoon)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of Steven Nachshen. (Hanski, Adam)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zauo Inc.. (pc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SC 150-152 West 24 LLC. (pc)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SC 150-152 West 24 LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zauo Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SC 150-152 West 24 LLC, Zauo Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17122551)Document filed by Steven Nachshen.(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachshen v. SC 150-152 West 24 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zauo Inc.
Represented By: Younghoon Ji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC 150-152 West 24 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?