Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv05858
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER terminating #5 Motion for Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant may proceed anonymously as John Doe in this action unless and until the Court orders otherwise. 2. Plaintiff may not initiate settlement discussions prior to service of the Complaint without leave of this Court. Nevertheless, if Defendant initiates such discussions, Plaintiff is permitted to participate therein and to settle the case. 3. Plaintiff may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on the ISP seeking only the name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned the IP address set forth in the Complaint in this action. Plaintiff is not permitted to subpoena the Defendants telephone number or email address. The subpoena must attach a copy of this Order, along with the attached Notice to Defendant. Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on any other ISP that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services to the Defendant. 4. The ISP shall have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena and this Order upon it to serve Defendant with a copy of the subpoena, a copy of this Order, and a copy of the attached Notice to Defendant. The ISP may serve Defendant using any reasonable means, such as written notice to a last known address, transmitted either by first-class mail or via overnight service. 5. Defendant shall have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena and this Order upon her or him to file any motion with this Court contesting the subpoena (including a motion to quash or to modify the subpoena). The ISP may not turn over Defendant's information to Plaintiff prior to the close of this 60-day period. Additionally, if Defendant or the ISP files a motion to quash the subpoena, the ISP may not turn over any information to Plaintiff until the issue has been resolved and the Court has issued an order instructing the ISP to resume in turning over the requested discovery. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. Plaintiff is further directed to file a status letter with the Court no later than December 20, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. 5. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/2019) (js)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(James, Jacqueline)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17124520)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?