Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv05862
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Discovery. Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Strike 3 may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on Verizon Online LLC, the ISP identified in its motion, to obtain information to identify John Doe, specifically her or his true name and current and permanent address. Plaintiff is expressly not permitted to subpoena the ISPs for John Doe's email addresses or telephone numbers. The subpoena shall have a copy of this order attached, along with the attached "Notice to Defendant." (As further set forth in this Order.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any information ultimately disclosed to Strike 3 in response to a Rule 45 subpoena may be used by Strike 3 solely for the purpose of protecting Strike 3's rights as set forth in its complaint. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/25/2019) (cf)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(James, Jacqueline)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, October 25, 2019 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/15/2019) (kv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17124629)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?