Nazario v. Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nazario
Defendant: Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05923
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Babchik on behalf of Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.. (Babchik, Jack)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Siobhan Amanda Healy on behalf of Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.. (Healy, Siobhan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lizabeth Schalet on behalf of Jennifer Nazario. (Schalet, Lizabeth)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Cacace on behalf of Jennifer Nazario. (Cacace, Karen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.. (dnh)
June 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morris Heights Health Center, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Nazario. (Lee, Lillian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, Lillian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17132609)Document filed by Jennifer Nazario.(Lee, Lillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazario v. Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Siobhan Amanda Healy
Represented By: Jack Babchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nazario
Represented By: Lillian Jihae Lee
Represented By: Lizabeth Schalet
Represented By: Karen Cacace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?