Shalit v. Schachter
Plaintiff: Jacob Shalit
Defendant: Kenny Schachter
Case Number: 1:2019cv05971
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT: Plaintiff Jacob Shalit and Defendant Kenny Schachter hereby stipulate that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended until September 3, 2019. The Complaint was personally served on Defendant on June 27, 2019, and his response is currently due on July 18, 2019. This is Defendant's first request for an extension of time to answer or move in response to the Complaint in this Action. Plaintiff has consented to this request. SO ORDERED., Kenny Schachter answer due 9/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/18/2019) (ama)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kenny Schachter served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service was accepted by Kenny Schachter. Document filed by Jacob Shalit. (Sobelsohn, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Kenny Schachter. (Kiernan, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Saltzman on behalf of Kenny Schachter. (Saltzman, Zachary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John S. Kiernan on behalf of Kenny Schachter. (Kiernan, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Daniel Ethan Sobelsohn on behalf of Jacob Shalit. New Address: The Sobelsohn Law Firm, 16027 Ventura Blvd., Suite 502, Encino, CA, USA 91436, (818) 722-8995. (Sobelsohn, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenny Schachter. (jgo)
June 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Ethan Sobelsohn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenny Schachter, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacob Shalit. (Sobelsohn, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sobelsohn, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenny Schachter. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17143729)Document filed by Jacob Shalit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobelsohn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shalit v. Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Schachter
Represented By: Zachary Saltzman
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Shalit
Represented By: Daniel Ethan Sobelsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?