Sollinger v. SmileDirectClub, LLC
Plaintiff: TAYLOR SOLLINGER
Defendant: SmileDirectClub, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05977
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332dtp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendant SmileDirectClub, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Proceedings. addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Justin Kuehn dated August 23, 2019. Document filed by Taylor Sollinger.(Kuehn, Justin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Jay Stone on behalf of Taylor Sollinger. (Stone, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendant SmileDirectClub, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Proceedings. Document filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(Barrie, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JULY 31, 2019. SHOULD DEFENDANT, AS ANTICIPATED, FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL AUGUST 30, 2019, TO FILE A RESPONSE AND DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 16, 2019, TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION. IN THE EVENT THAT A MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS FILED AND DENIED, DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE TWENTY-ONE DAYS FOLLOWING THE DENIAL OF THE MOTION WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SDC Financial, LLC for SmileDirectClub, LLC. Document filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC.(Barrie, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Michael J. Barrie dated July 24, 2019. Document filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC.(Barrie, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jason Barrie on behalf of SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Barrie, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. SmileDirectClub, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was accepted by Office of NY Sec. of State. Document filed by Taylor Sollinger. (Kuehn, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against SmileDirectClub, LLC. Document filed by Taylor Sollinger.(Kuehn, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SmileDirectClub, LLC. (pc)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Justin Aaron Kuehn to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
June 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin Aaron Kuehn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (pc)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Aaron Kuehn. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TAYLOR SOLLINGER. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SMILEDIRECTCLUB, LLC,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by TAYLOR SOLLINGER. (Kuehn, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kuehn, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against TAYLOR SOLLINGER. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17144658)Document filed by TAYLOR SOLLINGER.(Kuehn, Justin) Modified on 6/27/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sollinger v. SmileDirectClub, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR SOLLINGER
Represented By: Justin Aaron Kuehn
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmileDirectClub, LLC
Represented By: Michael Jason Barrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?