Vida Longevity Fund, LP v. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Plaintiff: Vida Longevity Fund, LP
Defendant: Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv06004
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint (Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Motty Shulman dated July 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York answer due 9/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/19/2019) (rj)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint (Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Motty Shulman dated July 18, 2019. Document filed by Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York.(Shulman, Motty)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Villacastin on behalf of Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (Villacastin, Andrew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Francis La Salle, III on behalf of Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (La Salle, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Motty Shulman on behalf of Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (Shulman, Motty)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Borden Vickery on behalf of Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (Vickery, Alan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/11/2019) (rj)
July 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vida Longevity Fund, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Steven G. Sklaver, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sklaver, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. Service was accepted by COLLEEN DRAPER, DESIGNATED AGENT. Document filed by Vida Longevity Fund, LP. (Ard, Seth)
July 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17220640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17220640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vida Longevity Fund, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Steven G. Sklaver, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sklaver, Steven) Modified on 7/10/2019 (wb).
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (jgo)
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Seth D. Ard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Vida Longevity Fund, LP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Seth D. Ard. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand none;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (jgo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vida Longevity Fund, LP. (Ard, Seth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ard, Seth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Vida Longevity Fund, LP.(Ard, Seth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17151335)Document filed by Vida Longevity Fund, LP.(Ard, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vida Longevity Fund, LP v. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Longevity Fund, LP
Represented By: Seth D. Ard
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Represented By: Alan Borden Vickery
Represented By: John Francis La Salle, III
Represented By: Andrew Villacastin
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?