Kim v. Hawaiian Air Lines et al
Plaintiff: Yvonne Kim
Defendant: Jack and Jill Does 1-2, Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. and Hawaiian Air Lines
Case Number: 1:2019cv06028
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abram I. Bohrer on behalf of Yvonne Kim. (Bohrer, Abram)
August 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory D. Speier on behalf of Hawaiian Air Lines. (Speier, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Oliver K. Beiersdorf. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hawaiian Air Lines. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Oliver K. Beiersdorf. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand None; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Beiersdorf, Oliver)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. for Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Document filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc..(Beiersdorf, Oliver)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 153755/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17156462).Document filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service for Amended Summons & Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Verified Answer, #4 Exhibit D - CPLR 3017 Demand, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Response to CPLR 3017 Demand, #6 Exhibit F - Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Beiersdorf, Oliver)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Hawaiian Air Lines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Kim
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack and Jill Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Oliver K. Beiersdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Air Lines
Represented By: Oliver K. Beiersdorf
Represented By: Gregory D. Speier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?