Cassiopeia IP LLC v. Hitachi America, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Cassiopeia IP LLC
Defendant: Hitachi America, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06029
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Hitachi America, Ltd. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Patent No. US7322046)(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, to the undersigned counsel and subject to the approval of the Court, that the time within which Defendant shall file an answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Infringement of Patent (D.I.1) be extended from August 6, 2019 to September 5, 2019. The parties have made no previous requests for extension. An extension is necessary to allow the Defendant to evaluate the Complaint. The parties are next scheduled to appear before the Court at the initial pretrial conference on September 19, 2019. Hitachi America, Ltd. answer due 9/5/2019. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/31/2019) (ne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Nicholas Loaknauth to RE-FILE Document #17 Proposed Order. Use the event type Other Filings, Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. The document also needs to have handwritten signatures of both attorneys. (km)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/29/2019 (km).
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hitachi America, Ltd. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service was accepted by Tillie Lim, Associate General Counsel. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Jean G. Vidal-Font to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for Jean G. Vidal-Font to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Jean G. Vidal-Font to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jean G. Vidal-Font, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #10 MOTION for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17248452. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #11 MOTION for Jean G. Vidal-Font to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17248482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Puerto Rico; Pursuant to Rule 1.3. the Attorney Affidavit missing the language of disciplinary.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jean G. Vidal-Font to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17248482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Loaknauth, Nicholas) Modified on 7/16/2019 (wb).
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17248452. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Loaknauth, Nicholas) Modified on 7/16/2019 (wb).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 19, 2019 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. (as further set forth in this Order). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/28/2019) (kv)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hitachi America, Ltd.. (pne)
June 28, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pne)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pne)
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicholas Netram Loaknauth to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed; no courthouse selection was made; jury demanded on complaint but not selected on civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Loaknauth, Nicholas) Modified on 6/28/2019 (pne).
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC.(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hitachi America, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hitachi America, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17156613)Document filed by Cassiopeia IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Patent No. US7322046)(Loaknauth, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassiopeia IP LLC v. Hitachi America, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi America, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassiopeia IP LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Netram Loaknauth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?