Genger v. Broser et al
Plaintiff: Sagi Genger
Defendant: TEDCO Inc., Arnold Broser, ADBG LLC, Genger Litigation Trust, Arie Genger, David Broser and Police Officers John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv06100
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Sagi Genger. ENDORSEMENT: Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a), this action is hereby stayed pending the outcome of the Debtor's bankruptcy proceedings. The parties are directed to provide the Court with a status update related to the bankruptcy proceeding by on or before October 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/21/2019) (kv)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record . Document filed by Sagi Genger(Dellaportas, John)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 16, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-08181-VSB-DCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADBG LLC, Arnold Broser, David Broser, David Broser, John Does 1-10, Arie Genger, TEDCO Inc.. (dnh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID BROSER, individually and as trustee of the GENGER LITIGATION TRUST, ARNOLD BROSER, ADBG LLC, TEDCO, INC., ARIE GENGER and JOHN DOES 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sagi Genger. (Dellaportas, John)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Dellaportas to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; defendant listed on the PDF contains a typographical error(ADGB LLC). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID BROSER, individually and as trustee of the GENGER LITIGATION TRUST, ARNOLD BROSER, ADBG LLC, TEDCO, INC., ARIE GENGER and JOHN DOES 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sagi Genger. (Dellaportas, John) Modified on 7/3/2019 (dnh).
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Dellaportas to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; defendant party name contains a typographical error (ABDG LLC). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-8181. Document filed by Sagi Genger.(Dellaportas, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID BROSER, individually and as trustee of the GENGER LITIGATION TRUST, ARNOLD BROSER, ADBG LLC, TEDCO, INC., ARIE GENGER and JOHN DOES 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sagi Genger. (Dellaportas, John) Modified on 7/2/2019 (dnh).
July 1, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John Does 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Sagi Genger. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Dellaportas, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dellaportas, John)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Dellaportas to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Genger Litigation Trust is not a party listed on the pleading caption and must be removed from rider; rider is titled 'List of Defendants for Civil Cover Sheet'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Dellaportas re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; John Does 1-10 must be added to the case. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Dellaportas. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Broser, David Broser. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Dellaportas to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no citizenship selection made for parties. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Dellaportas. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
July 1, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 17CV8181. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John Dellaportas, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID BROSER, individually and as trustee of the GENGER LITIGATION TRUST, ARNOLD BROSER, ADBG LLC, TEDCO, INC., ARIE GENGER, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sagi Genger. (Dellaportas, John) Modified on 7/1/2019 (pne).
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dellaportas, John) Modified on 7/1/2019 (pne).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADBG LLC, Arnold Broser, David Broser, Arie Genger, Genger Litigation Trust, TEDCO Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17167420)Document filed by Sagi Genger.(Dellaportas, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genger v. Broser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sagi Genger
Represented By: John Dellaportas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEDCO Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Broser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADBG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genger Litigation Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arie Genger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Broser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officers John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?