Chen v. L & H Wine & Liquor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jinxu Chen
Defendant: Longhua Lin, Jianhao Ren, Jian Hao Ren, L & H Wine & Liquor, Inc. and Long Hua Lin
Case Number: 1:2019cv06115
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to JIANHAO REN a/k/a Jian Hao Ren. Document filed by Jinxu Chen. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to LONGHUA LIN a/k/a Long Hua Lin. Document filed by Jinxu Chen. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to L & H WINE & LIQUOR, INC d/b/a L & H Wine and Liquor. Document filed by Jinxu Chen. Request for Waiver Mailed on 7/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Troy, John)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/3/2019) (jca)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to L & H Wine & Liquor, Inc., Longhua Lin, Jianhao Ren. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Queens. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jinxu Chen ;L & H Wine & Liquor, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
June 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Jinxu Chen. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
June 30, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jinxu Chen.(Troy, John)
June 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to L & H WINE & LIQUOR, INC d/b/a L & H Wine and Liquor; LONGHUA LIN a/k/a Long Hua Lin, and JIANHAO REN a/k/a Jian Hao Ren, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jinxu Chen. (Troy, John)
June 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L & H Wine & Liquor, Inc., Longhua Lin, Jianhao Ren. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17168959)Document filed by Jinxu Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. L & H Wine & Liquor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longhua Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianhao Ren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Hao Ren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L & H Wine & Liquor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Hua Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinxu Chen
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?