Tripicchio v. PVH Corporation
Plaintiff: Vincent Tripicchio
Defendant: PVH Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv06147
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey H. Warshafsky on behalf of PVH Corporation. (Warshafsky, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods Part One on 8/27/2019) PVH Corporation answer due 9/25/2019 (ks)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lawrence I. Weinstein dated 08/26/2019. Document filed by PVH Corporation.(Weinstein, Lawrence)
August 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PVH Corporation. (gp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PVH Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vincent Tripicchio. (Schmierer, Ross)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ross Howard Schmierer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Vincent Tripicchio. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ross Howard Schmierer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
July 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schmierer, Ross)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PVH Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17175662)Document filed by Vincent Tripicchio.(Schmierer, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripicchio v. PVH Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Tripicchio
Represented By: Ross Howard Schmierer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVH Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence I. Weinstein
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Warshafsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?