Doby v. Farag et al
Plaintiff: Sharon G Doby
Defendant: Wael S Farag and Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06186
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 81. Document filed by Sharon G Doby.(Elbaum, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on July 2, 2019. (Dkt. No. 1.) A Notice of Removal must contain "a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon the defendant." 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). In its Notice of Removal, Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. failed to attach the Summons and Complaint filed in state court. (See Dkt. No. 1 at paragraph 8.) It has also failed to answer or otherwise respond the complaint within seven days of the filing of the Notice of Removal as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2)(C). Plaintiff is directed to file a copy of her state law complaint on or before August 21, 2019. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 4, 2019. Further, the subject of this dispute is a car accident that took place in Queens, New York. (Dkt. No. 1 at paragraph 2.) The United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York encompasses Queens, New York. Accordingly, the parties are additionally directed to file a joint letter showing cause as to why the instant action should not be transferred to that court on or before September 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/14/2019) (rro)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rory L. Lubin on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Lubin, Rory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rory L. Lubin on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Lubin, Rory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Patrick Fusco on behalf of Wael S Farag. (Fusco, Joseph)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J. Elbaum on behalf of Sharon G Doby. (Elbaum, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on July 2, 2019. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than August 2, 2019. Counsel for the defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by July 26, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/10/2019) (ama)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so redesignated. (jc)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Elizabeth Danielle Ho Sing. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.(Ho Sing, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Ho Sing, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ho Sing, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160022/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17183263).Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand for Ad Damnum, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Demand for Ad Damnum)(Ho Sing, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doby v. Farag et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wael S Farag
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Danielle Ho Sing
Represented By: Rory L. Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon G Doby
Represented By: Brian J. Elbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?