Abrams et al v. Carranza et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Diaz, Donna Cornett, Luis Nunez, Yarely Mora, Janice Torres, Arelis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Abdon Lopez, Anthony McFarlane, Patrick Donohue, as Parent and Natural Guardian of S.J.D., Luis Araujo, Carolyn Mason, Michael Erde, Jhoana Juca, Judith Maysonet, Neysha Cruz, Kentaro Mizuta, Charlise Ellis, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Susanne Erde, Yvonne Davis, Nahoko Mizuta, Anthony Dixon, Brenda Melendez, John Burgess, Dore Abrams, Onaney Polanco, Alexandra Fiallos, Elizabeth Abrams, Andrew Loakman, Luis Nunez, Sr. and Patrick Donohue
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"), Richard Carranza and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv06194
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Status Report,, filed by Luis Nunez, Sr., Nahoko Mizuta, Michael Erde, Brenda Melendez, Neysha Cruz, Donna Cornett, Elizabeth Abrams, John Burgess, Kentaro Mizuta, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Dore Abrams, Justyna Pyka, Arelis Araujo, Anthony McFarlane, Alexandra Fiallos, Susanne Erde, Abdon Lopez, Patrick Donohue, Anthony Dixon, Onaney Polanco, Claudia Rivas, Judith Maysonet, Janice Torres, Andrew Loakman, Carolyn Mason, Yvonne Davis, Jhoana Juca, Yarely Mora, Ariel Diaz, Charlise Ellis. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's motion for fees is due September 9, 2019. The opposition is due September 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/9/2019., Responses due by 9/23/2019) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/29/2019) (kv)
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 7/22/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/22/2019 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Andrew J. Rauchberg dated August 15, 2019 re: Response to Plaintiffs' 8-13-19 letter. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education.(Rauchberg, Andrew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT. e: Status of Payments & Request for Clarification of Order. Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Sr., Patrick Donohue, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres.(Ashanti, Karl)
July 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 7/22/2019, ( Motions for atty. fees due by 7/5/2019., Responses due by 8/26/2019). (Jones, Brigitte)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Sr., Patrick Donohue, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres. (Albert, Peter)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the representations made by defendants that, with one exception, all invoices at issue have been or will be paid, a status conference will be held on July 22, 2019 at 2:30 p.m., to ascertain whether any issues remain in dispute between the parties. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/17/2019) (ne)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Glenn Albert to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the names of all parties for whom the summons is being requested must be entered on the summons request PDF; 'Richard Carranza' was entered on the docket entry text, but does not appear in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF; caption entered on the summons request PDF is incorrect; use the name of the first listed plaintiff followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Rauchberg in Support re: #13 CROSS MOTION for Sanctions .. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 CROSS MOTION for Sanctions . Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education.(Rauchberg, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . and in support of cross-motion for sanctions pursuant to 28 USC 1927. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Rauchberg in Opposition re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' 6-27-19 Email, #2 Defendants' 6-27-19 Email, #3 Plaintiffs' 6-28-19 Email, #4 Defendants' 6-28-19 Email, #5 Defendants' 6-28-19 Email, #6 Plaintiffs' 6-28-19 Email, #7 Defendants' 6-28-19 Email, #8 Plaintiffs' 7-1-19 Email, #9 Defendants' 7-1-19 Email, #10 Defendants' 7-2-19 Email, #11 Plaintiffs' 7-2-19 Email, #12 Plaintiffs' 7-2-19 Email, #13 Defedants' 7-3-19 Email, #14 Plaintiffs' 7-3-19 Email, #15 Defendants' 7-3-19 Email, #16 Plaintiffs' 7-3-19 Email)(Rauchberg, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Thomas M. Beam in Opposition re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Peter G. Albert in Support re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Sr., Patrick Donohue, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Albert, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Sr., Patrick Donohue, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres. (Albert, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Sr., Patrick Donohue, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres. Return Date set for 7/23/2019 at 02:30 PM.(Albert, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education and Richard Carranza, re: #5 Complaint,,. Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Sr., Patrick Donohue, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres. (Albert, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education. Document filed by Abdon Lopez, John Burgess, Arelis Araujo, Michael Erde, Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Neysha Cruz, Yarely Mora, Susanne Erde, Kentaro Mizuta, Luis Araujo, Justyna Pyka, Janice Torres, Anthony Dixon, Nahoko Mizuta, Brenda Melendez, Luis Nunez, Sr., Onaney Polanco, Judith Maysonet, Carolyn Mason, Anthony McFarlane, Andrew Loakman, Donna Cornett, Alexandra Fiallos, Claudia Rivas, Ariel Diaz, Patrick Donohue, Yvonne Davis, Jhoana Juca, Charlise Ellis, Victor Arteaga.(Albert, Peter)
July 10, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 19-cv-4175 and declined by Judge Alison J. Nathan. Case already reassigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (jc)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Glenn Albert to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to the omitted parties, all of the filers were not selected for the request for issuance of summons. All of the parties listed in the docket entry as to whom the summons is being requested must be listed on the summons PDF.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 1:19-cv-04175-AJN. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter Glenn Albert. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter Glenn Albert. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Abdon Lopez, John Burgess, Arelis Araujo, Michael Erde, Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Neysha Cruz, Yarely Mora, Susanne Erde, Kentaro Mizuta, Luis Araujo, Justyna Pyka, Janice Torres, Anthony Dixon, Nahoko Mizuta, Brenda Melendez, Luis Nunez, Onaney Polanco, Judith Maysonet, Carolyn Mason, Anthony McFarlane, Andrew Loakman, Donna Cornett, Alexandra Fiallos, Claudia Rivas, Ariel Diaz, Patrick Donohue, as Parent and Natural Guardian of S.J.D., Yvonne Davis, Jhoana Juca, Charlise Ellis, Victor Arteaga, Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education ("DOE"). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Peter Glenn Albert to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; all of the parties must be individually selected by holding the 'Ctrl' button. All of the parties were not added on CM/ECF; add all of the plaintiffs a second time with corresponding party text (Individually). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Carranza and NYC Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Patrick Donohue, as Parent and Natural Guardian of S.J.D., Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres. (Albert, Peter) Modified on 7/3/2019 (dnh).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Peter G. Albert re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-4175 (AJN). Document filed by Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Donna Cornett, Neysha Cruz, Yvonne Davis, Ariel Diaz, Anthony Dixon, Patrick Donohue, as Parent and Natural Guardian of S.J.D., Charlise Ellis, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Alexandra Fiallos, Jhoana Juca, Andrew Loakman, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Judith Maysonet, Anthony McFarlane, Brenda Melendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Luis Nunez, Onaney Polanco, Justyna Pyka, Claudia Rivas, Janice Torres.(Albert, Peter)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Albert, Peter)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17184237)Document filed by Abdon Lopez, John Burgess, Arelis Araujo, Michael Erde, Dore Abrams, Elizabeth Abrams, Neysha Cruz, Yarely Mora, Susanne Erde, Kentaro Mizuta, Luis Araujo, Justyna Pyka, Janice Torres, Anthony Dixon, Nahoko Mizuta, Brenda Melendez, Luis Nunez, Onaney Polanco, Judith Maysonet, Carolyn Mason, Anthony McFarlane, Andrew Loakman, Donna Cornett, Alexandra Fiallos, Claudia Rivas, Ariel Diaz, Patrick Donohue, as Parent and Natural Guardian of S.J.D., Yvonne Davis, Jhoana Juca, Charlise Ellis, Victor Arteaga.(Albert, Peter) Modified on 7/3/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams et al v. Carranza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Diaz
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cornett
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Nunez
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yarely Mora
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Torres
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arelis Araujo
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Arteaga
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdon Lopez
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony McFarlane
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Donohue, as Parent and Natural Guardian of S.J.D.
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Araujo
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Mason
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Erde
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhoana Juca
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Maysonet
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neysha Cruz
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentaro Mizuta
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlise Ellis
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justyna Pyka
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Rivas
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Erde
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Davis
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahoko Mizuta
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dixon
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Melendez
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Burgess
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dore Abrams
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onaney Polanco
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Fiallos
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Abrams
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Loakman
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Nunez, Sr.
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Donohue
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Carranza
Represented By: Andrew James Rauchberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Andrew James Rauchberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?