Warley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kareem C. Warley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv06203
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Pantoja on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Pantoja, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Mailed a copy of #9 Order, to Kareem C. Warley 1905 2nd Avenue Apt. 1C New York, NY 10029. (vba)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Moses. All pretrial motions and applications must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Moses. The parties are reminded that, under the Standing Order, memoranda filed in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion shall not exceed 25 pages, and reply memoranda shall not exceed 10 pages. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 7/17/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Kareem C. Warley, at 1905 2nd Avenue, Apt. 1C, New York, NY 10029, on 7/11/2019 Re: #6 Order of Service - Social Security via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), in social security cases only, a flyer about pro bono attorneys available through the New York County Lawyers' Association. (bwa)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/10/2019) (ne)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court shall notify the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York of the filing of this pro se case brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for which the filing fee has been waived. In accordance with the Standing Order "Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases", 16-MC-0171: Within 90 days of the date of this Order, the Commissioner must serve and file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR), which will constitute the Commissioner's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, the Commissioner must do so within 60 days of the date on which the e-CAR was filed. The motion must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and a full description of the underlying administrative proceeding. The plaintiff must file an answering brief within 60 days of the filing of the Commissioner's motion. The Commissioner may file a reply within 21 days thereafter. Memoranda in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion may not exceed 25 pages in length; reply memoranda may not exceed ten pages in length. A party seeking to exceed these page limitations must apply to the Court for leave to do so, with copies to all counsel, no fewer than seven days before the date on which the memorandum is due. In addition, by separate Order today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. Magistrate Judges are judges selected by the District Judges to serve for terms of eight years. Magistrate Judges are highly qualified and very experienced. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 10/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/10/2019) (ne) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. Modified on 7/12/2019 (ne).
July 10, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application to Kareem C. Warley 1905 2nd Avenue Apt. 1C New York, NY 10029. (vba)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/8/2019) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 3, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Standing Order re Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases, to Kareem C. Warley 1905 2nd Avenue Apt. 1C New York, NY 10029. (vba)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Kareem C. Warley. (sac)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kareem C. Warley.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem C. Warley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?