The Children's Village, Inc. v. Harleysville Insurance Company of New York
Plaintiff: The Children's Village, Inc.
Defendant: Harleysville Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv06225
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Letter Motion requesting a Pre-Motion Conference. ECF No. 8. That request is hereby DENIED. The Court is also in receipt of Plaintiffs Letter dated August 1, 2019. ECF No. 10. Pursuant to that Letter, this action is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/5/2019) (ks)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Lily Ockert dated August 1, 2019 re: Dismissal of action without prejudice. Document filed by The Children's Village, Inc..(Ockert, Lily)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lily Anne Ockert on behalf of The Children's Village, Inc.. (Ockert, Lily)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Lance J. Kalik dated July 10, 2019. Document filed by Harleysville Insurance Company of New York.(Kalik, Lance)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc. for Harleysville Insurance Company of New York. Document filed by Harleysville Insurance Company of New York.(Kalik, Lance)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lance Jon Kalik to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 26403/2019E..Document filed by Harleysville Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits- Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A -Summons and Complaint with Exhibits Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits Part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits Part 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits Part 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C - Amended Declaratory Judgment, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service)(Kalik, Lance)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lance Jon Kalik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lance Jon Kalik to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, all exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brooks Howard Leonard on behalf of Harleysville Insurance Company of New York. (Leonard, Brooks)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Elizabeth A. Filardi, Esq. on July 3, 2019. Service was made by Mail - Fed Ex. Document filed by Harleysville Insurance Company of New York. (Kalik, Lance)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Harleysville Insurance Company of New York. Document filed by Harleysville Insurance Company of New York.(Kalik, Lance) Modified on 7/10/2019 (ldi).
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kalik, Lance)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 26403/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17188713).Document filed by Harleysville Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Kalik, Lance) Modified on 7/8/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Children's Village, Inc. v. Harleysville Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Children's Village, Inc.
Represented By: Lily Anne Ockert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Brooks Howard Leonard
Represented By: Lance Jon Kalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?