Tarax Tarax et al v. Blossom West Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Getulio Lopez Murillo, Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera, Efrain Tarax Tarax and Santos Tarax
Defendant: Ramiro Ramirez, Chino Doe, Blossom West Inc., Ronen Seri and Jesus Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv06228
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/28/2019) (ks)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yolanda Rivero on behalf of Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Tarax(individually), Santos Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(individually). (Rivero, Yolanda)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronen Seri. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ramiro Ramirez. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jesus Doe. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chino Doe. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blossom West Inc.. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chino Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Tarax(individually), Santos Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jesus Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Tarax(individually), Santos Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ramiro Ramirez, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Tarax(individually), Santos Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ronen Seri, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Tarax(individually), Santos Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Blossom West Inc. (d/b/a Blossom on Columbus), re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(individually), Getulio Lopez Murillo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Tarax(individually), Santos Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blossom West Inc., Chino Doe, Jesus Doe, Ramiro Ramirez, Ronen Seri. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17188938)Document filed by Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Getulio Lopez Murillo(individually), Santos Tarax(individually), Efrain Tarax Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Tarax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Getulio Lopez Murillo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Efrain Tarax Tarax(individually), Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera(individually).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarax Tarax et al v. Blossom West Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramiro Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chino Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blossom West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronen Seri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Getulio Lopez Murillo
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Yolanda Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Jesus Sontay Herrera
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Yolanda Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Tarax Tarax
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Yolanda Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Tarax
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Yolanda Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?