Arup North America, Ltd. v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Arup North America, Ltd.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06236
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 9/16/2019. (cf)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 16, 2019. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/16/2019) (cf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Judah A. Druck dated August 16, 2019. Document filed by Arup North America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Druck, Judah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on Zurich American Insurance Company on 07/22/2019. Service was accepted by Dora Lewis, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Arup North America, Ltd.. (Druck, Judah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zurich American Insurance Company. (pc)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Judah Adam Druck. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:8705; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zurich American Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arup North America, Ltd.. (Druck, Judah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Arup Americas, Inc. for Arup North America, Ltd.. Document filed by Arup North America, Ltd..(Druck, Judah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Druck, Judah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17191351)Document filed by Arup North America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Druck, Judah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arup North America, Ltd. v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arup North America, Ltd.
Represented By: Judah Adam Druck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?