OffWhite Productions LLC v. Off---White LLC
Plaintiff: OffWhite Productions LLC
Defendant: Off---White LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06267
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Nicholas W. Laird to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17540532. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Off---White LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IL Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Nicholas Laird, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Laird, Nicholas)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. Defendant's answer is due September 9, 2019. Off---White LLC answer due 9/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/7/2019) (mro)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #9 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jason M. Drangel dated August 6, 2019. Document filed by Off---White LLC.(Drangel, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason M. Drangel on behalf of Off---White LLC. (Drangel, Jason)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Off---White LLC. (dnh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Off--White LLC, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by OffWhite Productions LLC. (Coleman, Ronald)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Off---White LLC. Document filed by OffWhite Productions LLC.(Coleman, Ronald)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to a properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by OffWhite Productions LLC.(MacMull, Joel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Off--White LLC, re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by OffWhite Productions LLC. (Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jgo).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Off---White LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by OffWhite Productions LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jgo).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: OffWhite Productions LLC, Off---White LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 7, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(MacMull, Joel)
July 7, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (MacMull, Joel)
July 7, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Off--White LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by OffWhite Productions LLC. (MacMull, Joel) Modified on 7/8/2019 (dnh).
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR COMPLAINT against Off---White LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17198541)Document filed by OffWhite Productions LLC.(MacMull, Joel) Modified on 7/8/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OffWhite Productions LLC v. Off---White LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off---White LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Drangel
Represented By: Nicholas Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OffWhite Productions LLC
Represented By: Joel Geoffrey MacMull
Represented By: Ronald David Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?