Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C. v. LiceDoctors LLC
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C., d/b/a Juva Skin and Laser Center and Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C.
Defendant: LiceDoctors LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06303
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. SO ORDERED. LiceDoctors LLC answer due 10/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/29/2019) (rj)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Alan E. Schoenfeld dated August 28, 2019. Document filed by LiceDoctors LLC.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LiceDoctors LLC.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of LiceDoctors LLC. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. LiceDoctors LLC waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Document filed by Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C.. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Taylor T. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/11/2019) (rj)
July 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Taylor True Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #5 MOTION for Taylor True Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17222432, paid on 7/10/2019. (wb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Taylor True Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Taylor)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Zelman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LiceDoctors LLC. (pne)
July 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LiceDoctors LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C., d/b/a Juva Skin and Laser Center. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LiceDoctors LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17204165)Document filed by Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C., d/b/a Juva Skin and Laser Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Fax Advertisement)(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C. v. LiceDoctors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LiceDoctors LLC
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C., d/b/a Juva Skin and Laser Center
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Katz, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Represented By: Taylor True Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?