Spray Moret, LLC v. Virtual Threads, Inc.
Plaintiff: Spray Moret, LLC
Defendant: Virtual Threads, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06315
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Virtual Threads, Inc.. (dnh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Virtual Threads, Inc., re: #10 Complaint. Document filed by Spray Moret, LLC. (Coleman, Ronald)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Virtual Threads, Inc.. Document filed by Spray Moret, LLC.(Coleman, Ronald)
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons is linked to a deficient pleading. Please correct pleading defeciencies before requesting a summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Virtual Threads, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Spray Moret, LLC. (Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dnh).
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (sj)
July 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the correct official A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ronald David Coleman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:0044. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1114. (sj)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Coleman, Ronald)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Coleman, Ronald)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Virtual Threads, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Spray Moret, LLC. (Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sj).
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Spray Moret, LLC.(Coleman, Ronald)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Coleman, Ronald)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Virtual Threads, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17206139)Document filed by Spray Moret, LLC.(Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spray Moret, LLC v. Virtual Threads, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtual Threads, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spray Moret, LLC
Represented By: Ronald David Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?