Frith v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jerry Frith
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv06341
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This Court previously denied defendant Jerry Frith's motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate the Court's Judgment revoking his term of supervised release. See Order Denying Motion to Vacate, ECF No. 76. Frith now seeks to appeal that Order. Because Frith has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/25/2019) (jca)
July 26, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
July 26, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry Frith were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #3 Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),,. Document filed by Jerry Frith. [This document also entered in case: 02-cr-0733-1]. (nd)
July 25, 2019 Appeal Fee Due: for #4 Notice of Appeal. $505.00 Appeal fee due by 8/8/2019. (nd)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28 U.S.C. 2255): Accordingly, Frith' s motion is denied. The Court further certifies that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, as Frith's claim lacks any arguable basis in law or fact, and therefore permission to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) (3). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close entry number 75 of docket 02-cr-733 and entry number 1 of docket 19-cv-6341, and to close the civil case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/11/2019) (jwh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28 U.S.C. 2255). NO FURTHER ENTRIES. PLEASE SEE CRIMINAL CASE: 02-cr-733 (JSR).Document filed by Jerry Frith.(rdz)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:02-cr-00733-JSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (rdz)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frith v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Frith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?