Ma v. DH Newland Corp. et al
Plaintiff: GUOCHANG MA
Defendant: DH NEWLAND CORP. and DUFAN LI
Case Number: 1:2019cv06348
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 26:7434
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by DH Newland Corp., Dufan Li.(Tsai, Pi Hui)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lanzhou Fire Club Food & Beverage Culture Co. Ltd, Corporate Parent Haokun Liu for DH Newland Corp.. Document filed by DH Newland Corp., Dufan Li.(Tsai, Pi Hui)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. DH Newland Corp. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Shaaida Sun, Office Assistant. Document filed by Guochang Ma. (Harrison, Baya)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dufan Li served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Shaaida Sun, Office Assistant. Document filed by Guochang Ma. (Harrison, Baya)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/11/2019) (rj) Modified on 7/12/2019 (rj).
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dufan Li. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DH Newland Corp.. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Baya Whitman Harrison, IV. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Guochang Ma; DH Newland Corp.; Dufan Li. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Baya Whitman Harrison, IV. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 370 (Other Fraud); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 890 (Other Statutory Actions); the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Harrison, Baya)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GUOCHANG MA.(Harrison, Baya)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dufan Li, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GUOCHANG MA. (Harrison, Baya)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DH NEWLAND CORP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GUOCHANG MA. (Harrison, Baya)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DH NEWLAND CORP., DUFAN LI. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17212266)Document filed by GUOCHANG MA.(Harrison, Baya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ma v. DH Newland Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUOCHANG MA
Represented By: Baya Whitman Harrison, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH NEWLAND CORP.
Represented By: Pi Hui Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUFAN LI
Represented By: Pi Hui Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?