Horizon Group USA, Inc. v. Anker Play Products, LLC
Plaintiff: Horizon Group USA, Inc.
Defendant: Anker Play Products, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06356
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 9/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/5/2019) (gr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James S. Yu dated September 5, 2019. Document filed by Anker Play Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation)(Yu, James)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the respective parties hereto, that the time of Defendant Anker Play Products, LLC to answer, move with respect to, or otherwise respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff Horizon Group USA, Inc. shall be extended to and including Thursday, September 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. Anker Play Products, LLC answer due 9/5/2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/21/2019) (jca)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Adam Schachter on behalf of Anker Play Products, LLC. (Schachter, Jeremy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James S. Yu dated August 21, 2019. Document filed by Anker Play Products, LLC.(Yu, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James S. Yu on behalf of Anker Play Products, LLC. (Yu, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Denise Cote's Individual Practices in Civil Cases served on Anker Play Products, LLC on August 13, 2019. Document filed by Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Furst, Sherli)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Scott Boczko on behalf of Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Boczko, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. By the date of the pretrial conference counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court, at the time and place listed below. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 conference, and to prepare a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. Prior to the date of the conference, all parties must send the Court one copy of all pleadings. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: SEPTEMBER 27, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 18B AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, 10007. (Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/12/19) (yv)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Anker Play Products, LLC served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. Service was accepted by Barry Smith, Agent Authorized to Accept Service, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Rosini, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Armin Ghiam on behalf of Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Ghiam, Armin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sherli M. Furst on behalf of Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Furst, Sherli)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Rosini, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anker Play Products, LLC. (pc)
July 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James E. Rosini. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Rosini, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Horizon Group USA, Inc..(Rosini, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anker Play Products, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Rosini, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosini, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anker Play Products, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17213397)Document filed by Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint)(Rosini, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horizon Group USA, Inc. v. Anker Play Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker Play Products, LLC
Represented By: James S. Yu
Represented By: Jeremy Adam Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Boczko
Represented By: Armin Ghiam
Represented By: Sherli M. Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?