Morris et al v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: DIANA MORRIS and Judy Anne Morgan
Defendant: Reichhold Liquidation, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, Union Carbide Corporation and Reichhold Liquidation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06367
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332as
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT pursuant to request from Chambers on 9/6/2019. Deleted document number 19 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) General Electric Company, Reichhold Liquidation, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by Diana Morris, Judy Anne Morgan. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Hendler, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Union Carbide Corporation. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Scott Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Rebecca Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Union Carbide Corporation, re: #13 Complaint. Document filed by Judy Anne Morgan, Diana Morris. (Webber, Rebecca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against General Electric Company, Reichhold Liquidation, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by Diana Morris, Judy Anne Morgan.(Webber, Rebecca)
July 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 AMENDED MOTION for Scott Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED MOTION for Scott Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Judy Anne Morgan, Diana Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendler, Scott)
July 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 AMENDED MOTION for Rebecca Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED MOTION for Rebecca Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Judy Anne Morgan, Diana Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Webber, Rebecca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Union Carbide Corporation. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reichhold Liquidation, Inc.. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Electric Company. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rebecca Ruth Webber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rebecca Ruth Webber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, Reichhold Liquidation, DIANA MORRIS, Judy Anne Morgan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Ruth Webber to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
July 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Rebecca Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17216234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for Scott Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17216238. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Scott Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17216238. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DIANA MORRIS, Judy Anne Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Webber, Rebecca) Modified on 7/10/2019 (wb).
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Rebecca Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17216234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DIANA MORRIS, Judy Anne Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Webber, Rebecca) Modified on 7/10/2019 (wb).
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Union Carbide Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DIANA MORRIS, Judy Anne Morgan. (Webber, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Reichhold Liquidation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DIANA MORRIS, Judy Anne Morgan. (Webber, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Electric Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DIANA MORRIS, Judy Anne Morgan. (Webber, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Webber, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR COMPLAINT against GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, Reichhold Liquidation, Union Carbide Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17216190)Document filed by DIANA MORRIS, Judy Anne Morgan.(Webber, Rebecca) Modified on 7/10/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA MORRIS
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Webber
Represented By: Scott M. Hendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Anne Morgan
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Webber
Represented By: Scott M. Hendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reichhold Liquidation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reichhold Liquidation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?