Securities and Exchange Commission v. Blakstad et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Martha Patricia Bustos and Donald G. Blakstad
Case Number: 1:2019cv06387
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/8/2019) (jca)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Martha Patricia Bustos waiver sent on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kelly, Christopher)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Donald G. Blakstad served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kelly, Christopher)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jennifer Chun Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Jennifer Chun Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Jennifer Chun Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Barry, Jennifer)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald G. Blakstad. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martha Patricia Bustos. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martha Patricia Bustos, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kelly, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald G. Blakstad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kelly, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kelly, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald G. Blakstad, Martha Patricia Bustos. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Kelly, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Blakstad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Patricia Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald G. Blakstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Christopher Reynolds Kelly
Represented By: Jennifer Chun Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?