Tom James Company v. Label, LLC
Plaintiff: Tom James Company
Defendant: Label, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06393
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George A Stohner on behalf of Tom James Company. (Stohner, George)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant's time to respond to the complaint is extended through September 30, 2019. The initial conference is adjourned to October 11, 2019, at 10:00 A.M. Joint pre-conference submissions are due no later than October 3, 2019. If the parties believe a settlement conference with the assigned magistrate judge would be helpful, they may file a joint request for a referral. SO ORDERED. Label, LLC answer due 9/30/2019( Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.). (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/14/2019) (ama)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jason Solotaroff dated 8/14/2019., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jason Solotaroff dated 8/14/2019. Document filed by Label, LLC.(Solotaroff, Jason)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for George A. Stohner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/8/2019) (jwh)
August 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for George A. Stohner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for George A. Stohner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tom James Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of George A. Stohner in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Philbin, James)
August 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #10 MOTION for George A. Stohner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17375372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for George A. Stohner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17375372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tom James Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of George A. Stohner in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Philbin, James) Modified on 8/6/2019 (wb).
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/25/2019) (ks)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James P. Philbin, III on behalf of Tom James Company. (Philbin, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #8 Notice) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James P. Philbin, III on behalf of Label, LLC. (Philbin, James) Modified on 7/17/2019 (db).
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Vecchione DeMarco on behalf of Tom James Company. (DeMarco, Joseph)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Label, LLC. (pne)
July 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Label, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tom James Company. (Hirschberg, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hirschberg, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tom James Company.(Hirschberg, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Label, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17221780)Document filed by Tom James Company.(Hirschberg, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom James Company v. Label, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Label, LLC
Represented By: Jason Louis Solotaroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom James Company
Represented By: David Milton Hirschberg
Represented By: George A Stohner
Represented By: Joseph Vecchione DeMarco
Represented By: James P. Philbin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?