Nagy v. MHP Land Associates LLC et al
Plaintiff: Levente Nagy
Defendant: ABC Corp., Ogden CAP Properties, LLC, MHP Land Associates LLC, ES Builders Group LLC, Mastic Assocaites of New York LLC and Mastic Associates of New York LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06395
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer; Rule 7.1 Statement served on Ronai & Ronai, LLP; Nicoll Davis & Spinella LLP on August 28, 2019. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by MHP Land Associates LLC, Mastic Associates of New York LLC, Ogden CAP Properties, LLC. (Schlesinger, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against ABC Corp., ES Builders Group LLC. Document filed by Mastic Associates of New York LLC, MHP Land Associates LLC, Ogden CAP Properties, LLC.(Schlesinger, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MHP Land Associates LLC, Mastic Associates of New York LLC, Ogden CAP Properties, LLC.(Schlesinger, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by MHP Land Associates LLC, Mastic Associates of New York LLC, Ogden CAP Properties, LLC. (Schlesinger, Eric)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #7 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against ES Builders Group LLC. Document filed by ES Builders Group LLC.(DePalma, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ES Builders Group LLC.(DePalma, Steven)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Steven Schlesinger on behalf of MHP Land Associates LLC, Mastic Associates of New York LLC, Ogden CAP Properties, LLC. (Schlesinger, Eric)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendant ES Builders Group LLC may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including August 27, 2019; and ES Builders Group LLC waives any defenses or objections as to personal jurisdiction and service of the Summons and Complaint. No other provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver and Defendant ES Builders Group LLC expressly reserves, any and all other defenses. There has been no previous request for extension of tiri1e in connection with this matter. SO ORDERED. ES Builders Group LLC answer due 8/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/20/2019) (jca)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ES Builders Group LLC. (DePalma, Steven)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Costos DePalma on behalf of ES Builders Group LLC. (DePalma, Steven)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. ES Builders Group LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Mastic Associates of New York LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. MHP Land Associates LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Ogden CAP Properties, LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/15/2019) (jca)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ogden CAP Properties, LLC. (sj)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MHP Land Associates LLC. (sj)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mastic Associates of New York LLC. (sj)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ES Builders Group LLC. (sj)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against ABC Corp., ES Builders Group LLC, MHP Land Associates LLC, Mastic Associates of New York LLC, Ogden CAP Properties, LLC. Document filed by Levente Nagy.(Ronai, Holly)
July 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Holly Ostrov Ronai. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mastic Associates of New York LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
July 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Holly Ostrov Ronai to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ogden CAP Properties, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MHP Land Associates LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mastic Associates of New York, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ES Builders Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Levente Nagy. (Ronai, Holly)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ronai, Holly)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against ABC Corp., ES Builders Group LLC, MHP Land Associates LLC, Mastic Assocaites of New York LLC, Ogden CAP Properties, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17222072)Document filed by Levente Nagy.(Ronai, Holly) Modified on 7/11/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagy v. MHP Land Associates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogden CAP Properties, LLC
Represented By: Eric Steven Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHP Land Associates LLC
Represented By: Eric Steven Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ES Builders Group LLC
Represented By: Steven Costos DePalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastic Assocaites of New York LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastic Associates of New York LLC
Represented By: Eric Steven Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levente Nagy
Represented By: Holly Ostrov Ronai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?