Brown v. National Basketball Association (NBA)
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bernice Brown
Defendant: National Basketball Association (Nba)
Case Number: 1:2019cv06434
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Mailed a copy of #8 Order Granting IFP Application, Terminate Motions, to Kimberly Bernice Brown 1026 Wicklow Rd Baltimore, MD 21229. (aea)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. Motions terminated: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kimberly Bernice Brown. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/8/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Kimberly B. Brown, dated 8/8/19 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court immediately assign a judge to this case, and she informs the Court that she is harrassed daily as her life has been placed in "harm's way." Document filed by Kimberly Bernice Brown.(sc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending #1 Complaint against National Basketball Association (Nba).Document filed by Kimberly Bernice Brown. Related document: #1 Complaint.(sc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Kimberly B. Brown, dated 7/18/19 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court grant her permission to amend her complaint as well as expedite the process by which she may recover $500,000 dollars in damages etc. Document filed by Kimberly Bernice Brown.(sc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia; Case Number: 1:19-cv-01559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of New York. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/11/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KIMBERLY BERNICE BROWN (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/11/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL BASKETBALL ASSOCIATION (NBA) filed by KIMBERLY BERNICE BROWN.(zeg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/14/2019) (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/11/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 5/28/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. National Basketball Association (NBA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Basketball Association (Nba)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bernice Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?