Sharpe Innovations, Inc. v. US Mobile LLC
Plaintiff: Sharpe Innovations, Inc.
Defendant: US Mobile LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06436
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: US Mobile LLC answer due 10/8/2019. (jca)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/3/2019) (jca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Garfield B. Simms dated September 3, 2019. Document filed by US Mobile LLC.(Simms, Garfield)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Garfield B. Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/15/2019) (jwh)
August 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Garfield B. Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17425735. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Garfield B. Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17425735. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by US Mobile LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cometti, Mario)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Isaac Rabicoff dated 8/8/2019. Document filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. US Mobile LLC answer due 9/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/8/2019) (rjm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Isaac Rabicoff dated 8/8/2019. Document filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc..(Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mario David Cometti on behalf of US Mobile LLC. (Cometti, Mario)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/22/2019) (rro)
July 14, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 14, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against US Mobile LLC. Document filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/12/2019) (kv)
July 12, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Mobile LLC. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Isaac Rabicoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1338; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:271; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Isaac Rabicoff to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Isaac Rabicoff to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17225580. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17225580. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl of Rabicoff, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to US Mobile LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc..(Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 7/12/2019 (jgo).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against US Mobile LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17225488)Document filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 7/12/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe Innovations, Inc. v. US Mobile LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharpe Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Mobile LLC
Represented By: Mario David Cometti
Represented By: Garfield B. Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?