Fortune v. Buzzfeed, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Fortune
Defendant: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06464
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Buzzfeed, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Fortune. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Liebowitz, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2019. (ama)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file his amended complaint is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint is now due no later than August 28, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket number 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/28/2019) (ama)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint (1 Day Past Deadline) addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard Liebowitz dated 8/27/19. Document filed by James Fortune.(Liebowitz, Richard)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiff's application for leave to amend his Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) is granted. The amended complaint must be filed no later than August 26, 2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard Liebowitz dated 8/22/19. Document filed by James Fortune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Liebowitz, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Plaintiffs August 5, 2019 request for leave to file a motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 7, is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to file and serve its motion is September 16, 2019. Defendants opposition is due within twenty-one days after service of Plaintiffs motion; Plaintiffs reply, if any, is due within seven days after service of Defendants opposition. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on August 15, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
August 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 8/13/2019. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (Daniels, Anthony)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard Liebowitz dated 8/6/2019 re: #7 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Nancy A. Del Pizzo dated August 5, 2019. . Document filed by James Fortune. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 03:15 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (jwh)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #7 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: Application granted in part. The Court will hold a teleconference to discuss Defendant's anticipated motion on August 13, 2019 at 3:15 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/6/2019) (jwh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Nancy A. Del Pizzo dated August 5, 2019. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Del Pizzo, Nancy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media LLC for Buzzfeed, Inc.. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Del Pizzo, Nancy)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: September 12, 2019. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: September 19, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/30/2019) (ama)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buzzfeed, Inc.. (sj)
July 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
July 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buzzfeed, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James Fortune. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17231674)Document filed by James Fortune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortune v. Buzzfeed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fortune
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Ann Del Pizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?