Margadonna v. Astrazeneca LP et al
Plaintiff: Terrilynn Margadonna
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. and Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv06470
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
August 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ad)
August 5, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-md-02776-LGS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-09444-LGS. Document filed by Terrilynn Margadonna.(Burke, Daniel)
July 24, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lorna G. Schofield as possibly related to 17-md-2776. (jgo)
July 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel C. Burke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Daniel C. Burke to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the related case number is incorrect on the docket entry; the incorrect case number and status for the earlier filed case is on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Document filed by Terrilynn Margadonna.(Burke, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel C. Burke to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF was titled incorrectly. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/24/2019. (jgo)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Document filed by Terrilynn Margadonna.(Burke, Daniel) Modified on 7/19/2019 (jgo).
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel C. Burke to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF case captionn must list all of the parties and may not contain 'et al'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/22/2019. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-09444-LGS. Document filed by Terrilynn Margadonna.(Burke, Daniel) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jgo).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Daniel) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jgo).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Document filed by Terrilynn Margadonna.(Burke, Daniel) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jgo).
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Daniel C. Burke, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel C. Burke to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Daniel C. Burke. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel C. Burke to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF must contain a caption listing Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/22/2019. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17232489)Document filed by Terrilynn Margadonna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Daniel) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margadonna v. Astrazeneca LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrilynn Margadonna
Represented By: Daniel C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?