Mont v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shannon Mont
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv06491
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Colleen Branagan on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Branagan, Susan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Shannon Mont. (Kaplan, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (pc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shannon Mont. (Kaplan, William)
August 1, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Scheduling Order, to United States Attorney's Office SDNY Attn: Chief of Civil 86 Chambers Street New York, NY 10007. (vba)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties should follow the schedule set forth in the Standing Order at ECF No. 4. Any stipulation entered between the parties including, but not limited to, a remand to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings, must be approved by the district judge, unless the parties consent to my jurisdiction over the case for all purposes. The parties shall advise the Court as to whether they jointly consent to decision of this action by this United States magistrate judge. The Clerk of Court is ordered to send this order to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/31/2019) (ras) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/24/2019) (ama)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/24/2019) (ama)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pc)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William D. Kaplan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:416;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:405;. (pc)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William D. Kaplan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shannon Mont, Commissioner of Social Security. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Shannon Mont.(Kaplan, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kaplan, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Shannon Mont.(Kaplan, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mont v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susan Colleen Branagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Mont
Represented By: William D. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?