City of Dearborn Heights ACT 345 Police and Fire Retirement System v. Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: City of Dearborn Heights ACT 345 Police and Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Christopher A. Chapman, Andreas Walter Mattes and Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv06514
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska dated September 6, 2019 re: appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of lead counsel. Document filed by Christopher A. Chapman, Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated, Andreas Walter Mattes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion papers filed in Ohio)(Yadava, Nidhi)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nidhi Yadava on behalf of Christopher A. Chapman, Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated, Andreas Walter Mattes. (Yadava, Nidhi)
August 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 6, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-06180-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-6180 (LAP). Document filed by City of Dearborn Heights ACT 345 Police and Fire Retirement System.(Portnoy, Lesley)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
July 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 19cv6180. (sj)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher A. Chapman, Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated, Andreas Walter Mattes. (sj)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated, Andreas Walter Mattes and Christopher A. Chapman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Dearborn Heights ACT 345 Police and Fire Retirement System. (Portnoy, Lesley)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher A. Chapman, Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated, Andreas Walter Mattes. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17238337)Document filed by City of Dearborn Heights ACT 345 Police and Fire Retirement System.(Portnoy, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Dearborn Heights ACT 345 Police and Fire Retirement System v. Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dearborn Heights ACT 345 Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Chapman
Represented By: Nidhi Yadava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas Walter Mattes
Represented By: Nidhi Yadava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diebold Nixdorf, Incorporated
Represented By: Nidhi Yadava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?