Hemingway v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Marcus Hemingway
Defendant: General Motors L.L.C. and General Motor
Case Number: 1:2019cv06528
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER NO. 164: Consistent with the Courts comments and discussion with the parties at the status conference, by Thursday, September 12, 2019, New GM shall provide to Lead Counsel its proposal for addressing whether and to what extent the parties' submissions in connection with themotions for summary judgment, class certification, and Daubert can remain sealed or redacted. The parties must meet and confer by no later than Thursday, October 3, 2019, and submit a joint letter on this issue setting forth their position(s) by no later than Thursday, October 10, 2019. (And as further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/5/2019., Responses due by 10/7/2019, Replies due by 10/18/2019., Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(jca)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Affected Plaintiffs on July 31, 2019. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 1. As this case, Hemingway v. General Motors LLC, 19-CV-6528, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. See 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5. Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543, Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/15/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:19-cv-06528-JMF(ne) Modified on 7/16/2019 (ne).
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina; Case Number: 4:19-cv-01580. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 15, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 15, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (ne)
July 15, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (sjo)
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
July 15, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (sjo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred to New York Southern District per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number: CTO-130. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (hcic, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/15/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marcus Hemingway Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint to General Motors, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service certified return receipt, #2 Affidavit of Service - General Motors LLC) (Cranshaw, Bradford) Modified on 6/21/2019 to replace incorrect document with correct document as provided by filing user (lsut, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/15/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. Service due by 9/3/2019. (lsut, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/4/2019 to correct document orientation) (lsut, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/15/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by General Motors, LLC. (lsut, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/15/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8478185), filed by Marcus Hemingway. (lsut, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemingway v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Hemingway
Represented By: Bradford William Cranshaw
Represented By: William Frederick O'Neil, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?