Miller v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Miller
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv06530
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Received returned mail re: #5 Order Directing Original Signature. Mail was addressed to Lisa M. Miller 3475 Third Avenue Bronx, NY 10456 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender; Insufficient Address; Unable to Forward. (aea)
August 6, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Directing Original Signature, to Lisa M. Miller 3475 Third Avenue Bronx, NY 10456. (aea)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to submit a signed signature page to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signature Page due by 9/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/5/19) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Signature page - complaint, #2 Supplement Signature page - IFP, #3 Supplement Signature page - electronic consent)(scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 16, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Standing Order re Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases, to Lisa M. Miller 3475 Third Avenue Bronx, NY 10456. (aea)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. Document filed by Lisa M. Miller.(sac)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Lisa M. Miller. (sac)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Lisa M. Miller.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?