Lynch v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Plaintiff: lynch lynch and Marie Lynch
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Case Number: 1:2019cv06536
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from ALAN MURAIDEKH dated August 8, 2019 re: letter enclosing Defendant's Answer filed. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
August 7, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Deborah A. Batts. (rjm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pre-trial conference in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on Thursday, September 19, 2019 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 24B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Counsel are directed to familiarize themselves with the Southern District of New York Local Rules and Electronic Court Filing Rules and Instructions, and this Court's Individual Rules of Practice. Pursuant to the Individual Rules, two courtesy copies of all pleadings must be submitted to Chambers. So ordered. Terminating #8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from ALAN MURAIDEKH dated AUGUST 2, 2019. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/7/2019) (rjm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from ALAN MURAIDEKH dated AUGUST 2, 2019. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pre-trial conference in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on Thursday, September 5, 2019 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 24B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Counsel are directed to familiarize themselves with the Southern District of New York Local Rules and Electronic Court Filing Rules and Instructions, and this Court's Individual Rules of Practice. Pursuant to the Individual Rules, two courtesy copies of all pleadings must be submitted to Chambers. (Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Deborah A. Batts.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/1/2019) (rro)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTA Metro-North Railroad. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marie Lynch; MTA Metro-North Railroad. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 45:56; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 45:51; the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Metro-North Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by lynch lynch. (Barkan, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Barkan, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTA Metro-North Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17242338)Document filed by lynch lynch.(Barkan, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: lynch lynch
Represented By: Steven Laurence Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lynch
Represented By: Steven Laurence Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?